Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ivan Tilak Jayasundera

Former Bishop-Elect of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1959 Born
3 Aug 198525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kandy, Sri Lanka
20 Jan 200646.1AppointedBishop of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka
6 Jul 200646.6ResignedBishop-Elect of Ratnapura, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Ivan Tilak Jayasundera
Father Ivan Tilak Jayasundera (born ) Former Bishop-Elect of Ratnapura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKandy

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ratnapura.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2006
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast