Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jozef Billiet, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Mountain Provinces, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1888Born
8 Sep 190820.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 Jul 191224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
15 Nov 193547.8AppointedPrefect of Mountain Provinces, Philippines
194758.9ResignedPrefect of Mountain Provinces, Philippines
12 Aug 196577.5DiedPrefect Emeritus of Mountain Provinces, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jozef Billiet
Father Jozef Billiet C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Mountain Provinces

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZottegem, Belgium
Death PlaceBaguio, Diocese of Baguio

  • a priest for 53.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast