Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Dominik Łopaciński

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1708³BornLopacinic Malaticen
8 May 173223.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 176253.7SelectedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
19 Apr 176253.9ConfirmedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
13 Jun 176254.0Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
11 Jan 177869.6DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Dominik Łopaciński:
Bishop Jan Dominik Łopaciński (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,883
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015