Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Conventati, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1667BornMonte Granaro
26 Nov 168821.1ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
26 Feb 171446.3AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
4 Mar 171446.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
3 Jul 172052.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
27 Nov 172659.1ResignedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
1739¹71.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Conventati:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Conventati C.O. (born , died 1739) Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 327, and Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015