Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jordan Zaninović, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1840Born
20 Sep 186222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Oct 190262.6SelectedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
10 Feb 190362.9ConfirmedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
19 Apr 190363.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
22 Oct 191777.6DiedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Jordan Zaninović (VIAF: 305487652)
Bishop Jordan Zaninović O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStarigrad [Civitavecchia]

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 451
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast