Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hector Wegmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1575AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
4 Jul 1575AppointedTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
22 Jan 1576Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
31 Jan 1589DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hector Wegmann (VIAF: 47534273)
Bishop Hector Wegmann (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 307
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast