Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gilbert, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1372AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
12 Sep 1375AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
22 May 1389AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
28 Jul 1397DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Gilbert:
Bishop John Gilbert O.P. (died ) Bishop of Hereford

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 274, and Page 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 127
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 463, and Page 295
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 100
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013