Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Visconti, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1609AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
29 Mar 1609Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
11 May 1638DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Visconti
Bishop Giambattista Visconti O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 46, Number 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,609, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast