Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottavio Cardinal Belmosto (Belmusti)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aleria, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Carlo ai Catinari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1559¹Born
31 Jul 159132.5AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
10 Dec 160849.9ResignedBishop of Aleria, France
19 Sep 161657.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 161657.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Carlo ai Catinari
16 Nov 161859.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Aleria, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Belmosto (Belmusti) (VIAF: 266154912)
Ottavio Cardinal Belmosto (Belmusti) (born 1559, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aleria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1616
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast