Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquim José Vieira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1836Born
8 Mar 186024.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 186024.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 188347.4SelectedBishop of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil
9 Aug 188347.5ConfirmedBishop of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil
9 Dec 188347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil
14 Sep 191276.6RetiredBishop of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil
14 Sep 191276.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Himeria
8 Nov 191276.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
8 Jul 191781.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim José Vieira
Archbishop Joaquim José Vieira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fortaleza (Ceará)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapetininga
Ordained BishopCampinas, Diocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,547
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017