Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mihály Karl (Michele Carlo) von Althan

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1702³BornGlatz
28 Apr 172623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 172623.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 172826.3AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
29 Sep 172826.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
8 Apr 173532.8SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vác, Hungary
2 Dec 173533.5ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vác, Hungary
17 Jul 175654.1DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mihály Karl (Michele Carlo) von Althan:
Archbishop Mihály Karl (Michele Carlo) von Althan (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015