Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Ferdinand-Adrien (Pierre) Simon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Dometiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1855Born
1877¹21.8ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
6 Oct 187722.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jun 187823.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Feb 188832.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
21 Feb 188832.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
24 Jun 188833.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
20 Jul 189338.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Ferdinand-Adrien (Pierre) Simon
Bishop Jean-Ferdinand-Adrien (Pierre) Simon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaillé-les-Marais, Diocese of Luçon, France
Ordained BishopMandalay
Death PlaceMandalay
Buried Place (Original)Sacré-Cœur, Chapel

  • a priest for 15.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017