Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Tasca

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalů, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1756³Born
21 Aug 182568.7SelectedBishop of Lipari, Italy
13 Mar 182669.3ConfirmedBishop of Lipari, Italy
21 May 182669.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
26 May 182770.5SelectedBishop of Cefalů, Italy
17 Sep 182770.8ConfirmedBishop of Cefalů, Italy
2 Jan 183982.1DiedBishop of Cefalů, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Tasca
Bishop Pietro Tasca (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalů

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1840
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 145, and Page 241
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast