Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismondo Taddei

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1631AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
27 Nov 1641AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
2 Oct 1647DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Taddei:
Bishop Sigismondo Taddei (died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 127, and Page 116
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014