Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Taccone

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1806Born
13 Jun 182922.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 184942.7SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
28 Sep 184942.8ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
14 Oct 184942.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
1 May 185043.4SelectedBishop of Teramo, Italy
30 Sep 185043.8ConfirmedBishop of Teramo, Italy
20 Oct 185649.9DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Taccone
Bishop Pasquale Taccone (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIonadi, Diocese of Mileto

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1856
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112, and Page 154
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast