Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Delamars

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1668BornKraków
4 Feb 169930.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 172355.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
20 Dec 172355.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
28 Jan 172556.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
7 Mar 172556.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Michal Delamars:
Bishop Michal Delamars (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,031

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014