Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Joachim Tarło

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1658³BornVadovicen
5 Dec 171859.9AppointedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
23 Apr 171960.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
7 Dec 172263.9SelectedBishop of Poznań, Poland
15 Mar 172364.2ConfirmedBishop of Poznań, Poland
13 Aug 173273.6DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Joachim Tarło:
Bishop Jan Joachim Tarło (born , died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,450
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015