Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walenty Konstantyn Czulski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

Titular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655²BornWesolowicz
12 Feb 172166.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
12 Feb 172166.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
1 Jun 172166.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
10 Feb 172469.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Walenty Konstantyn Czulski:
Bishop Walenty Konstantyn Czulski (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 161
  • ob/c2+: CB, 2 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,029

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Mar 2014