Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene Sweeney

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornRaphoe
18 Sep 162937.7AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
2 Mar 1634³42.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
18 Oct 166977.7DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugene Sweeney:
Bishop Eugene Sweeney (died ) Bishop of Kilmore

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015