Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Gabriel Rossillon de Bernex

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657BornCastriblanci
20 Dec 168125.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 169740.7AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
6 Oct 169740.8Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
23 Apr 173477.3DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Michel-Gabriel Rossillon de Bernex:
Bishop Michel-Gabriel Rossillon de Bernex (died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 208

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013