Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Agnello Suardi

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹BornMantova
5 Dec 161634.9AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
21 Dec 161634.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
13 May 161937.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mantova, Italy
2 Mar 162038.1SucceededBishop of Mantova, Italy
Sep 1644³62.6DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Agnello Suardi:
Bishop Vincenzo Agnello Suardi , Bishop of Mantova

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230, and Page 75
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 61, Number 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 24 Feb 2015