Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipione Agnelli

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornMantova
12 Feb 162432.1AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
18 Feb 162432.1Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
1 Oct 165361.7DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione Agnelli:
Bishop Scipione Agnelli (died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 83, Number 493
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 24 Feb 2015