Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zacharias Stumpf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

Titular Bishop of Domitiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594BornFladungen
22 Sep 163642.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
22 Sep 163642.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
15 Feb 163743.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Domitiopolis
30 Jan 164147.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Zacharias Stumpf:
Bishop Zacharias Stumpf (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Mar 2014