Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Chamberlain

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1576BornGand
1 Apr 160023.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 162851.5AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
5 Nov 162852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
19 Dec 163458.1DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Georges Chamberlain:
Bishop Georges Chamberlain (born , died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 5 Mar 2015