Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Troiano Caracciolo del Sole

Deceased

Bishop of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1685BornNapoli
1 Nov 173752.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Nov 173752.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 173852.2AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
9 Feb 173852.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
15 Feb 176478.3DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Troiano Caracciolo del Sole:
Bishop Troiano Caracciolo del Sole (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015