Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Girolamo Crispi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1667Born
13 Dec 169225.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172053.2AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
19 Jan 172153.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
13 Mar 172759.4ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
17 Dec 174275.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
16 Dec 174376.2AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
24 Jul 174678.8DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Crispi
Patriarch Girolamo Crispi (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 329
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75, and Page 215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast