Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Xavier Splényi

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1731BornTernyn
20 Aug 175826.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Sep 175826.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 178755.7SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
10 Mar 178856.3ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
13 Apr 178856.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
22 Dec 179564.0DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Xavier Splényi
Bishop Ferenc Xavier Splényi (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 429
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,787
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016