Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente José Soto y Valcárce

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1741BornRuitelán
26 Sep 180362.6AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
6 Nov 180362.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
16 Feb 181877.0DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Vicente José Soto y Valcárce:
Bishop Vicente José Soto y Valcárce (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 124, Number 660

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015