Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Sisternes de Oblites

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1748³BornOristano
5 Jun 177324.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 179849.6SelectedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
28 Sep 179849.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
18 Nov 179850.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
21 Jun 181263.6DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Sisternes de Oblites:
Archbishop Francisco Sisternes de Oblites (born , died ) Archbishop of Oristano

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 96
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,512

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013