Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Domenico Porqueddu

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1729³BornSenorbi
11 Jan 179262.0SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
26 Mar 179262.2ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
20 May 179262.4Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
1799¹69.0DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Domenico Porqueddu
Bishop Giuseppe Domenico Porqueddu (born , died 1799) Bishop of Iglesias

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,826
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016