Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Stanislao Paradiso

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1747BornCagliari
3 Jun 180759.6SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
18 Sep 180759.9ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
29 May 180860.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
27 Feb 181971.3SelectedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
29 Mar 181971.4ConfirmedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
4 Sep 1822³74.9DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Stanislao Paradiso:
Bishop Giuseppe Stanislao Paradiso (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

  • a bishop for 14.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 71, and Page 386
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,537

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013