Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph of Shrewsbury

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1329SelectedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
3 Sep 1329Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
14 Aug 1363DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph of Shrewsbury
Bishop Ralph of Shrewsbury (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 130
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 74
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast