Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Englefield

Deceased

Bishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Feb 1328SelectedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
24 Apr 1328ConfirmedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
12 Jun 1328Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
25 Apr 1357DiedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Englefield
Bishop Matthew Englefield (died ) Bishop of Bangor

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 127
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 73
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast