Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon Mepeham

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1327SelectedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
25 May 1328ConfirmedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 1328Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
12 Oct 1333DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Simon Mepeham:
Archbishop Simon Mepeham (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 163
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 73
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013