Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal Alberti, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1250¹BornPrato
1 Jul 129949.5AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
18 Dec 130353.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 130353.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
1 Apr 132171.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Alberti
Niccolò Cardinal Alberti O.P. (born 1250, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016