Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Severa

Deceased

Bishop of Terni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1792BornAnticoli
23 Sep 181522.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 183744.7AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
28 Oct 183744.8Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
12 Sep 185360.7AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
4 Aug 187077.6DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Severa
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Severa (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 321
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 153
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1837, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016