Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Angelo Seragli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1547AppointedBishop of Modruš, Croatia
1 May 1547Ordained BishopBishop of Modruš, Croatia
4 Jun 1548AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
1557²DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Angelo Seragli:
Bishop Filippo Angelo Seragli O.S.B. , Bishop of (unknown)

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 247, and Page 104
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014