Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Sadoleto

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1508¹Born
14 Feb 153527.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carpentras, France
18 Oct 154739.7SucceededBishop of Carpentras, France
30 Oct 154739.8Ordained BishopBishop of Carpentras, France
1572²64.0DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Sadoleto (VIAF: 75692067)
Bishop Paolo Sadoleto (born 1508, died 1572) Bishop of Carpentras

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Oct 2017