Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Mentovato

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Nov 1544AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
30 Oct 1547Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
8 Aug 1558AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
1560²DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Mentovato
Bishop Camillo Mentovato (died 1560) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 3 Oct 2017