Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Weber

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1539Born
1561²21.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
28 Feb 157031.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
28 Feb 157031.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
3 Aug 157031.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Missene (Mysia)
7 Aug 162283.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephan Weber (VIAF: 160426146)
Bishop Stephan Weber (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErfurt

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 52.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,889
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018