Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lothar Friedrich von Metternich-Burscheid

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz

Bishop of Speyer

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1617BornBurscheid
8 Sep 164022.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Apr 165234.5SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
17 Dec 165235.2Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
9 Jun 165335.6ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
24 Jun 165638.7Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
15 Dec 167053.2SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
26 Nov 167154.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
12 Feb 167355.3SucceededArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
16 Apr 167456.5AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
3 Jun 167557.6DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Lothar Friedrich von Metternich-Burscheid:
Archbishop Lothar Friedrich von Metternich-Burscheid (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 22.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 271, and Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015