Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philipp Christoph von Sötern

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1567Born
30 May 160941.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Dec 160941.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Speyer, Germany
10 Oct 161042.8SucceededBishop of Speyer, Germany
8 Aug 161244.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 161244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
25 Sep 162355.7SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
11 Mar 162456.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
1651¹83.0ResignedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
7 Feb 165284.1DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philipp Christoph von Sötern
Archbishop Philipp Christoph von Sötern (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZweibrücken

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 320, and Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast