Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf von Frankenstein

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524¹Born
3 Oct 155228.7SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
14 Nov 155228.8ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
26 Nov 155329.9Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
21 Jun 156036.4DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rudolf von Frankenstein (VIAF: 80983644)
Bishop Rudolf von Frankenstein (born 1524, died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Ordained BishopUdenheim

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018