Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Tassi

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹BornRoma
25 Jun 164650.4AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
1 Jul 164650.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
21 Nov 164751.8DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Tassi:
Bishop Alessandro Tassi (died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 330
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015