Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Andreas Seelmann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tremithus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1732Born
15 Mar 175522.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bamberg, Germany
20 Sep 175523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
1 Jun 177239.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
1 Jun 177239.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
28 Jun 177239.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
8 Oct 178957.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Andreas Seelmann
Bishop Johann Andreas Seelmann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEbensfeld

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,772, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 414, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast