Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blasius Laubich

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Titular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1604AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
24 Nov 1604AppointedTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
4 Dec 1604Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Symbalia (Cembalo)
5 Feb 1608DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Blasius Laubich:
Bishop Blasius Laubich (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,000
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013