Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Souleyman Sayegh

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1886Born
19 Jul 190821.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Nov 195367.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
27 Nov 195367.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
13 Jun 195467.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia
18 Sep 196174.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Souleyman Sayegh
Bishop Souleyman Sayegh (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mossul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast