Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Virgilio Cardinal Rosario

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1499²Born
27 Aug 155455.6AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
24 Feb 155556.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
15 Mar 155758.2Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 155758.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta
22 May 155960.3DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Virgilio Rosario
Virgilio Cardinal Rosario (born 1499, died ) Bishop of Ischia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto, Diocese of Spoleto
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 10 Oct 2017