Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sigismondo Saraceno

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1556AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
14 Sep 1556Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
7 Jan 1585DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Saraceno
Archbishop Sigismondo Saraceno (died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast