Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Airoldi

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1728BornPalermo
24 Feb 177849.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Mar 177850.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 177951.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
30 Nov 177951.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
1803²74.8AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
25 Mar 181789.0DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Airoldi
Archbishop Alfonso Airoldi (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016